Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 377 Today
» 1385 Yesterday
» 1762 Week
» 8567 Month
» 115513 Year
» 1337078 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3668 m/e 03/1940

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 03/1940
Withdrawal During 07/1963
Scrapping During 04/1964
Service Life 23 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
88C Barry 4w/e 16/06/1962
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88C Barry m/e 30/06/1962
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/02/1963
WDN   4w/e 27/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1940 To Service To service as GWR Number 3668
Built at Swindon Works
   
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 3668    

prev prev