Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 54 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17857 Week
» 70873 Month
» 190400 Year
» 3217253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3669 |
on |
26/03/1940 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
325 |
To Service |
Fri 26/03/1940 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 10/09/1965 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 5 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1965 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
TN |
Taunton |
4w/e |
07/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
83C |
Westbury |
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
ALLOC |
83C |
Westbury |
4w/e |
11/07/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/09/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/03/1940 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3669 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (PDN) |
|
|
07/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Taunton (TN) |
|
|
30/11/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (83C) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (83C) |
|
|
10/09/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3669 |
|
|
12/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|