Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1528 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19331 Week
» 72347 Month
» 191874 Year
» 3218727 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3674 |
28/05/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08512 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
09/1977 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
22/09/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
22/09/1977 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/05/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
09/1977 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
22/09/1977 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
28/05/1958 |
Power Unit IH4084 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/05/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3674 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
13/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
14/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08512 |
|
|
09/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
09/1977 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
22/09/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
22/09/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|