Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1806 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19609 Week
» 72625 Month
» 192152 Year
» 3219005 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3676 |
12/06/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08514 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
06/1977 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
30/06/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
30/06/1977 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/06/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
06/1977 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
30/06/1977 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
12/06/1958 |
Power Unit IH4105 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/06/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3676 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Hull Springhead (53C) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (53E) |
|
|
10/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
26/09/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08514 |
|
|
01/1977 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
02/1977 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Hull Botanic Gardens (BG) |
|
|
06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
30/06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/06/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
09/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
04/1978 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (BG) |
|
|