Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 157 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 5911 Week
» 33869 Month
» 68511 Year
» 1290076 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3677 18/06/1958
TOPS (Tops) 08515 11/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 18/06/1958
Withdrawn 20/01/1992
Time in Service 33 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys
Cut Up 13/02/2001
Cut At T J Thomson and Son Ltd. (at Gateshead MPD)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
51A Darlington (New) 18/06/1958
52A Gateshead w/e 18/07/1970
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill w/e 09/10/1971
64H Leith Central w/e 09/10/1971
   Withdrawn 20/01/1992

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
18/06/1958 Power Unit IH4103    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
18/06/1958 To Service To service as D3677
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Darlington (51A)
   
18/07/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Leith Central (64H)    
11/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08515    
20/01/1992 Withdrawn      
13/02/2001 Scrapped Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: at Gateshead MPD    

prev prev