Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1382 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19185 Week
» 72201 Month
» 191728 Year
» 3218581 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3678 |
11/08/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08516 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/08/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
11/08/1958 |
Power Unit IH4143 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/08/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3678 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
13/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08516 |
|
|
30/08/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (HS) |
|
|