Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1429 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19232 Week
» 72248 Month
» 191775 Year
» 3218628 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3679 |
15/08/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08517 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
To Service |
15/08/1958 to Percy Main (52E) |
Withdrawn |
20/07/2001 |
Time in Service |
42 yrs, 11 mths , 5 dys |
Status |
Awaiting Scrapping |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1977 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
10/03/1977 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/08/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
03/1977 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
10/03/1977 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
15/08/1958 |
Power Unit IH4145 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/08/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3679 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
13/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Blyth (North) (52F) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08517 |
|
|
21/03/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (HM) |
|
|
03/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
03/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO) |
|
|
10/03/1977 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
20/07/2001 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08517 |
|
|