Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 4252 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17658 Week
» 70674 Month
» 190201 Year
» 3217054 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3684 |
02/09/1958 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08522 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
02/09/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/09/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3684 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
30/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (30E) |
|
|
17/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08522 |
|
|
04/08/1985 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08522 from Cambridge (CA) |
|
|
26/10/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|