Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 253 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 253 Week
» 34828 Month
» 104307 Year
» 1325872 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3689 m/e 01/1941

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 01/1941
Withdrawal During 05/1964
Scrapping During 09/1964
Service Life 23 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84J Croes Newydd 4w/e 24/01/1959
88C Barry 4w/e 15/12/1962
88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 09/02/1963
88C Barry 4w/e 02/11/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SRD Stafford Road 4w/e 30/11/1946
ALLOC TYS Tyseley 4w/e 28/12/1946
ALLOC 84J Croes Newydd m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 88C Barry 5w/e 02/11/1963
WDN   06/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1941 To Service To service as GWR Number 3689
Built at Swindon Works
   
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (84J)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
02/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 3689    

prev prev