Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1562 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19365 Week
» 72381 Month
» 191908 Year
» 3218761 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3696 |
28/04/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08534 |
02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/04/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
28/04/1959 |
Power Unit IH4351 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/04/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3696 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
12/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (16D) |
|
|
04/08/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
19/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E) |
|
|
14/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (16F) |
|
|
28/02/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
24/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08534 |
|
|
10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (AN) |
|
|
04/09/1988 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
31/08/2005 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08534 |
|
|
05/2007 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|