Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 295 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18098 Week
» 71114 Month
» 190641 Year
» 3217494 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3698 |
07/05/1959 |
|
Pre TOPS (Class 13) |
D4500 |
06/1965 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
13003 |
1973 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 07/1975 |
|
Slow Speed Indicator fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/05/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
07/05/1959 |
Power Unit IH4348 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3698 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
15/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
06/1965 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4500 |
|
|
1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 13003 |
|
|
07/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Slow Speed Indicator fitted |
|
|