Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 575 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3718 Week
» 13888 Month
» 291684 Year
» 1176065 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3701 22/05/1959
TOPS (Tops) 08537 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 22/05/1959
Withdrawn 25/05/1990 off Immingham (IM)
Time in Service 31 yrs , 3 dys
Cut Up 04/11/1994
Cut At Coopers Metals (at Bescot MPD)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
41A Sheffield Darnall (New) 22/05/1959
41J Langwith Junction w/e 15/12/1962
IM Immingham 2w/e 11/10/1975
   Withdrawn 25/05/1990

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1971   Air Braked only  

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
22/05/1959 Power Unit IH4350    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
22/05/1959 To Service To service as D3701
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A)
   
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J)    
10/1971 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08537    
11/10/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IM)    
25/05/1990 Withdrawn Condemned as 08537 from Immingham (IM)    
04/11/1994 Scrapped Broken up by Coopers Metals: at Bescot MPD    

prev prev