Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 401 Today
» 1154 Yesterday
» 4923 Week
» 25825 Month
» 25825 Year
» 1247390 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3704 03/06/1959
TOPS (Tops) 08540 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 03/06/1959
Cut At EMR (Kingsbury)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 03/06/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
34D Hitchin (GNR) w/e 08/03/1969
55H Neville Hill w/e 14/08/1971
YK York (North) 2w/e 25/01/1976

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
08/1971   Air Braked only  

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
03/06/1959 Power Unit IH4319    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Scrapped Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury    
03/06/1959 To Service To service as D3704
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
08/03/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (34D)    
08/1971 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
14/08/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (55H)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08540    
25/01/1976 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    

prev prev