Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 235 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5579 Week
» 6469 Month
» 314450 Year
» 1198831 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3705 08/06/1959
TOPS (Tops) 08541 05/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 08/06/1959
Withdrawn 31/08/2005
Time in Service 46 yrs, 2 mths , 23 dys
Cut Up 31/05/2008
Cut At EMR (Kingsbury)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 08/06/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 09/08/1969
30A Stratford w/e 29/11/1969
   Withdrawn 31/08/2005

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1972   Air Braked only  

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
08/06/1959 Power Unit IH4314    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
08/06/1959 To Service To service as D3705
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
21/06/1969 Sightings Hornsey depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
09/08/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
29/11/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/1972 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08541    
31/08/2005 Withdrawn Condemned as 08541    
31/05/2008 Scrapped Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury    

prev prev