Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 98 Today
» 1103 Yesterday
» 5735 Week
» 18839 Month
» 18839 Year
» 1240404 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3706 15/06/1959
TOPS (Tops) 08542 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 15/06/1959
Withdrawn 31/08/2005
Time in Service 46 yrs, 2 mths , 16 dys
Cut Up 30/04/2006
Cut At Harry Needle Railroad Company (at Kingsbury)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) 15/06/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
30A Stratford 2w/e 04/09/1971
   Withdrawn 31/08/2005

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
10/1971   Air Braked only  

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
15/06/1959 Power Unit IH4306    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
15/06/1959 To Service To service as D3706
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
04/09/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/1971 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08542    
31/08/2005 Withdrawn Condemned as 08542    
30/04/2006 Scrapped Broken up by Harry Needle Railroad Company: at Kingsbury    

prev prev