|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/11/1959 | Brecon demotion | Brecon's allocation was divided from 2nd November, 1959-2219/36, 3638, 3706/47/67, 7794 to Newport (86A) and 46506/16/8/9/20/1/2 to Oswestry (89A) thus making the shed an overnight stabling depot. | SLS/196002 |
22/04/1962 | Brecon MPD | Despite the allocation of code 88K since January, 1961, no locomotive allocation has been made or shed plates cast; Ebbw Junc. and Oswestry supply locomotives as before. On 22nd April, the following were on shed-2218/40/7, 3691, 3706/14 of 86A and 46507/9/10/21/3 of 89D. Normally, two Brecon engines stable at Builth Road H.L. shed and on 22nd April these were 46508/19 of 89D. | SLS/196206 |
15/12/1963 | Swindon Works (Dump) | Triangle: 3653, 8425, 9425. Yard: D1060, D7092, 2818, 3668/71/6, 4111, 4555, 4690, 4987, 6000/10/25, 6159, 6831/48/9/50/9/61, 6922, 8738, 9645, 76037/76/81. Dump: 3706, 5201, 5787, 6011, 6151, 6618/31/74, 6724, 8103, 8461/91, 8791, 9401. 'A' Shop: D812/9/24/34/5/45/61, D1006/8/16/26/7/8/9/36/40/3/5/9/65, D3031, D3515/7/97, D3603/6/7, D6328, D7003/12/26/35/58, 4113/76, 5691, 6141/3, 6866, 6976/98, 7808/12/20/6, 7928, 9600/66, 73053/93, 76041, 92003. Ex-Works: 6858. Stored on Shed: 1006/27, 3842, 4631, 4924/96, 5017, 5357, 5814, 5904/43, 9604. | SLS/196401 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
19/10/1936 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 3706 Built at Swindon Works |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Brecon (BCN) | ||
31/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) | ||
13/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 3706 | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Scrapped |