Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1399 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19202 Week
» 72218 Month
» 191745 Year
» 3218598 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3710 |
on |
31/10/1936 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
299 |
To Service |
Fri 31/10/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 17/05/1963 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys |
Total Mileage |
524,996 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
ALLOC |
88C |
Barry |
4w/e |
10/09/1960 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
01/06/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/10/1936 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3710 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (PDN) |
|
|
09/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (84F) |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Barry (88C) |
|
|
17/05/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3710 |
|
|
12/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|