Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1668 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19471 Week
» 72487 Month
» 192014 Year
» 3218867 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3714 |
17/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08550 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
17/09/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
17/09/1959 |
Power Unit IH4434 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
17/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3714 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
26/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
28/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08550 |
|
|
13/12/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HI) |
|
|
06/03/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08550 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
05/1986 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|