Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 408 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 408 Week
» 22914 Month
» 326104 Year
» 1547669 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 3715 on 22/01/1937

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 299
To Service Fri 22/01/1937
Withdrawal Fri 19/03/1965
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 28 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 22/01/1937
81B Slough 4w/e 30/11/1950
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 31/03/1951
87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 27/03/1954
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 24/01/1959
81C Southall 4w/e 21/02/1959
84A Stafford Road 4w/e 27/02/1960
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 19/05/1962
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 28/09/1963
   Withdrawn on 19/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RDGw Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 09/08/1947
ALLOC 81B Slough 4w/e 04/11/1950
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 81C Southall 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road m/e 28/02/1959
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 19/05/1962
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/02/1963
TOSTORE   w/e 14/08/1963
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 29/09/1963
WDN   5w/e 12/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1946 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during March: 111, 1010, 2026/55, 2103, 2204/12/54, 2816/39/46/9, 2924/39/48/79, 3010/5/20, 3171, 3446, 3632, 3715/93 3855, 4012/33/5/55/79/82, 4136, 4365, 4565/70 4702, 4830/67, 4917/37/58/84/5, 5004/8/49/71/90, 5153/86/93, 5310/38/84/97, 5420, 5505/31/53, 5787,-5967/99, 6000/17/25/8, 6114/21/50/1, 6365/74/86/8 6417, 6916/8/41, 7312, 7713/32, 7802/10, 9721/60/3/80/7/90/6. Nameplates have been affixed to 1000/17-9, 6916/32/38/46/67. With the completion of 1019, there is a temporary halt in the programme of construction of '1000' Class locomotives and work is under way on new 'Castle' and 'Hall' Class locomotives. SLS/194606
31/08/1949 Swindon Works New Work August: Nos. 7025 Sudeley Castle PDN (2/8), 7026 Tenby Castle (15/8), 7027 Thornbury Castle LA (25/8); 1503 PDN (8/8), 1504 PDN (17/8), 1505 PDN (29/8). Nos. 7025-27 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1503-05 are unlined black. Contractor built: Nos. 8400 TYS, 8401 CDF, 8402 (W.G.B. 2912/49) PILL (26/8), 8450 (Y.E. Co. 2443/49) NPT (17/8). Nos. 8400-02/50 are unlined black. Condemned: Nos. 289 (original T.V. R/T boiler and curved top tanks), 1884 (closed cab), 1930 (open cab), 2902, 3182 an 3419. No. 6320 has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. 1000/04/25, 1427/37, 2117 (closed cab), 2211/12/14/21/67, 2462, 2815/52/75/87, 3016/20, 3174/86, 3635/77, 3715/99, 3805/14/43, 4013/15/33/47/80, 4107/48/49/55, 4269/78, 4502/10/59/65/82/92/95, 4637/50/79/97, 4906/51/81, 5001/18/30/42/57/76/80/94/99, 5206, 5344/45/80, 5501/05/22/37/54, 5749, 5804, 5904/12/21/27/44/45/47/66, 6000/04/19, 6105/07/43/61, 6338/77, 6408/31, 6741, 6808/19/28/29/44, 6905/65, 7219/36, 7310, 7414, 7718, 7815/16, 7904, 8789, 9638 an 90712. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1005/12, 4901/23/50, 5912/18 an 6920. September: A batch of new Class '2' 2-6-2T's and Class '4' 2-6-0's is to be built here. They will be similar to existing L.M.S. designs, but will have modified G.W.R. boilers. The frames have already been cut for five of the 2-6-0's. SLS/194910
14/10/1962 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works 1628/60, 2841/62, 3217, 3608/58, 3709/15/51/60/78, 4147, 4910/51, 5070, 5245, 5602, 6141, 6644/63/79, 6816, 6982, 7209, 8498, 9411/53, 9608/10/5/40/82. Ex-Works on shed: 9404/15; ex-Works on Oxley MPD; 4697, 7739. 'Kings' at Stafford Road minus numbers and nameplates: 6001/2/7/12/4/5/7/22. SLS/196211

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/01/1937 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 3715
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Slough (81B)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
24/01/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
19/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 3715    

prev prev