Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1630 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15036 Week
» 68052 Month
» 187579 Year
» 3214432 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3716 |
on |
26/01/1937 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
299 |
To Service |
Mon 26/01/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 02/12/1963 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys |
Total Mileage |
661,948 |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
CDF |
Cardiff Canton |
4w/e |
20/04/1946 |
ALLOC |
ABEEG |
Aberbeeg |
4w/e |
27/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
86J |
Aberdare |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
ALLOC |
88B |
Radyr |
2w/e |
17/11/1962 |
ALLOC |
88J |
Aberdare |
4w/e |
09/03/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/01/1937 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3716 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
01/12/1945 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
20/04/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Canton (CDF) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberbeeg (ABEEG) |
|
|
21/04/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdare (86J) |
|
|
17/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Radyr (88B) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdare (88J) |
|
|
02/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3716 |
|
|
03/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|