Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 591 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6568 Week
» 22766 Month
» 187666 Year
» 698768 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3719 13/04/1959
TOPS (Tops) 09008 01/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 09
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Darlington Works
To Service 13/04/1959
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) 13/04/1959
73E Faversham 6w/e 14/06/1959
73C Hither Green m/e 09/12/1963
73F Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 30/04/1972
CF Cardiff Canton 29/05/1988

Components
Fitted Component Details Removed Reason Removed
13/04/1959 Power Unit IH4340    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
13/04/1959 To Service To service as D3719
Built at Darlington Works
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
09/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
11/1970 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
30/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 09008    
29/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF)    

prev prev