Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3410 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16816 Week
» 69832 Month
» 189359 Year
» 3216212 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3726 |
18/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08559 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/12/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
18/12/1959 |
Power Unit IH4471 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3726 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
25/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wath (41C) |
|
|
02/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08559 |
|
|
30/08/1981 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to York (North) (YK) |
|
|
20/12/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08559 from York (North) (YK) |
|
|
29/10/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|