Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 4213 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 23124 Week
» 88078 Month
» 290742 Year
» 3317595 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3726 |
on |
25/06/1937 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
299 |
To Service |
Mon 25/06/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 08/01/1962 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 6 mths , 14 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1962 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ABEEG |
Aberbeeg |
4w/e |
03/11/1945 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/01/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/06/1937 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3726 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
03/11/1945 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
29/12/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT ) |
|
|
08/01/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3726 |
|
|
07/1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|