Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 126 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17929 Week
» 70945 Month
» 190472 Year
» 3217325 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3727 |
22/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08560 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/12/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
22/12/1959 |
Power Unit IH4476 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3727 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
15/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
13/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shirebrook (41J) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08560 |
|
|
31/05/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08560 from Shirebrook (SB) |
|
|
03/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|