Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 4028 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17434 Week
» 70450 Month
» 189977 Year
» 3216830 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3736 |
01/05/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08569 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/05/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3736 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
04/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) |
|
|
15/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
04/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
07/10/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08569 |
|
|
23/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (NH) |
|
|