Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 92 Today
» 1085 Yesterday
» 6148 Week
» 20725 Month
» 383970 Year
» 460557 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3737   09/1937

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 09/1937
Withdrawal During 09/1964
Scrapping During 04/1965
Service Life 27 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 24/03/1956
88F Treherbert 4w/e 27/07/1963
85B Gloucester Horton Road 5w/e 31/08/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82F Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 22/07/1963
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 27/07/1963
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 5w/e 31/08/1963
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1937 To Service To service as GWR Number 3737
Built at Swindon Works
   
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F)    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 3737    

prev prev