Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 759 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6364 Week
» 17911 Month
» 417593 Year
» 494180 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3738   09/1937

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 09/1937
Withdrawal During 08/1965
Service Life 27 yrs , 11 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 31/10/1950
88H Tondu 4w/e 08/10/1960
88G Llantrisant 3w/e 04/05/1964
88B Radyr 6w/e 12/10/1964
88A Cardiff East Dock 5w/e 16/05/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SLO Slough 4w/e 10/09/1949
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 17/10/1950
ALLOC 86F Aberbeeg 4w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 88G Llantrisant 3w/e 04/05/1964
ALLOC 88B Radyr w/e 12/10/1964
ALLOC 88A Cardiff East Dock 5w/e 16/05/1965
TOSTORE   4w/e 11/07/1965
WDN   m/e 31/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1937 To Service To service as GWR Number 3738
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
08/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tondu (88H)    
04/05/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Llantrisant (88G)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (88B)    
16/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88A)    
08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 3738    

prev prev