Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3070 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16476 Week
» 69492 Month
» 189019 Year
» 3215872 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
3739 |
on |
15/09/1937 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
57xx |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-0PT |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
306 |
To Service |
Mon 15/09/1937 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 19/10/1964 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 1 mth , 4 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/09/1961 |
Beyer-Peacock Works, Manchester |
On 9th September, W.R. 0-6-0 PTs 3699, 3739, 3747 an 9661 were noted under repair-part of a first order of 25 0-6-OPTs to be repaired. |
SLS/196110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/09/1937 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 3739 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swindon (SDN) |
|
|
21/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (82F) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Swindon (82C) |
|
|
09/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westbury (82D) |
|
|
19/10/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 3739 |
|
|
04/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|