Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1469 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19272 Week
» 72288 Month
» 191815 Year
» 3218668 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3747 |
04/07/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08580 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/07/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3747 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (CED) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08580 |
|
|