Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 31 Online
» 3658 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13232 Week
» 78186 Month
» 280850 Year
» 3307703 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3748 |
29/07/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08581 |
05/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/07/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3748 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) |
|
|
09/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
09/02/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08581 |
|
|
09/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|