Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3592 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16998 Week
» 70014 Month
» 189541 Year
» 3216394 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3749 |
04/08/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08582 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/08/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3749 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Newport Pill (86B) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) |
|
|
31/12/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (CED) |
|
|
03/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88M) |
|
|
02/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08582 |
|
|
30/09/2008 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08582 |
|
|
07/2009 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|