Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1111 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14517 Week
» 67533 Month
» 187060 Year
» 3213913 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3751 |
18/08/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08584 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/08/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3751 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
26/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
04/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
29/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08584 |
|
|
08/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) |
|
|
22/03/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) |
|
|
07/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BR) |
|
|
23/08/1991 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08584 from Laira (LA) |
|
|
29/10/1993 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|