Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1672 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15078 Week
» 68094 Month
» 187621 Year
» 3214474 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3759 |
27/10/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08592 |
04/1974 |
|
TOPS (08/9) |
08993 |
04/1985 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/10/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/10/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3759 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
12/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
01/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08592 |
|
|
08/12/1980 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (LE) |
|
|
04/1985 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08993 |
|
|