Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 387 Today
» 1370 Yesterday
» 7457 Week
» 4565 Month
» 111511 Year
» 1333076 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3759 m/e 12/1937

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 12/1937
Withdrawal During 12/1965
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 28 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 19/06/1954
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 02/11/1957
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 22/02/1958
71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 5w/e 18/07/1959
72A Exmouth Junction 2w/e 31/08/1963
85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 28/03/1965
85B Gloucester Horton Road 6w/e 19/09/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 12/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 02/11/1957
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 22/02/1958
ALLOC 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 12/07/1959
ALLOC 91S To Southern Region m/e 31/07/1959
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 5w/e 31/08/1963
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 16/09/1963
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 5w/e 12/04/1965
TOSTORE   4w/e 11/07/1965
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 5w/e 19/09/1965
WDN   7w/e 16/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1937 To Service To service as GWR Number 3759
Built at Swindon Works
   
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
02/11/1957 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
22/02/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G)    
31/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
28/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
19/09/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
12/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 3759    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev