Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1074 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18877 Week
» 71893 Month
» 191420 Year
» 3218273 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3760 |
12/11/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08593 |
12/1973 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
12/11/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3760 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
17/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Danygraig (DG) |
|
|
13/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Landore (87E) |
|
|
03/03/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86A) |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08593 |
|
|