Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3761 13/11/1959
TOPS (Tops) 08594 05/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Crewe Works
To Service 13/11/1959
Withdrawn 20/07/2001
Time in Service 41 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys
Cut At EMR (Kingsbury)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
87C Danygraig (New) 13/11/1959
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 30/01/1960
81C Southall 4w/e 27/02/1960
81A Old Oak Common 9w/e 25/01/1969
81F Oxford q/e 14/11/1970
CF Cardiff Canton w/e 11/08/1973
   Withdrawn 20/07/2001

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
0000 Scrapped Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury    
13/11/1959 To Service To service as D3761
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Danygraig (87C)
   
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
29/11/1964 Sightings Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop RO 1/1965 Link
25/01/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
29/06/1969 Sightings Old Oak Common depot: On shed RO 9/1969 Link
14/11/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
11/08/1973 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF)    
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08594    
20/07/2001 Withdrawn Condemned as 08594    

prev prev