Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 332 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18135 Week
» 71151 Month
» 190678 Year
» 3217531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3762 |
25/11/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08595 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/11/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3762 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Danygraig (87C) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
13/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southall (81C) |
|
|
25/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
02/01/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08595 |
|
|
23/07/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08595 from Doncaster (DR) |
|
|
18/10/1995 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|