Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 40 Today
» 1145 Yesterday
» 6086 Week
» 25731 Month
» 60373 Year
» 1281938 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 3763 m/e 12/1937

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 12/1937
Withdrawal During 06/1965
Scrapping During 10/1965
Service Life 27 yrs, 6 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
82C Swindon 4w/e 24/03/1956
81E Didcot 4w/e 19/05/1962
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 04/05/1963
81C Southall 3w/e 28/03/1965
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC WEY Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 07/08/1948
ALLOC SPM St Philips Marsh 4w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC WEY Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 19/05/1962
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 04/05/1963
ALLOC 81C Southall 5w/e 12/04/1965
WDN   16/06/1965
WDN   4w/e 11/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1937 To Service To service as GWR Number 3763
Built at Swindon Works
   
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
04/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
28/03/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Southall (81C)    
06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 3763    

prev prev