Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1258 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14664 Week
» 67680 Month
» 187207 Year
» 3214060 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3764 |
25/04/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08597 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/04/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/04/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3764 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
29/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
29/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
03/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08597 |
|
|