Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 560 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14603 Week
» 79557 Month
» 282221 Year
» 3309074 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3766 |
09/05/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08599 |
05/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 12/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/05/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3766 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
30/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
12/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
23/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
23/12/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
05/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08599 |
|
|
31/12/2007 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08599 |
|
|
03/2008 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T J Thomson and Son Ltd.: Stockton |
|
|