Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2627 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16033 Week
» 69049 Month
» 188576 Year
» 3215429 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3767 |
16/05/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08600 |
29/12/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
16/05/1959 to Longsight (9A) |
Withdrawn |
30/07/1999 |
Time in Service |
40 yrs, 2 mths , 14 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1973 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
12/1973 |
|
Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/05/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
12/1973 |
a |
Air brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3767 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
30/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
05/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
12/05/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (NH) |
|
|
12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
12/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed |
|
|
29/12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08600 |
|
|
12/01/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (WN) |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
30/07/1999 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08600 |
|
|