Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 4148 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13722 Week
» 78676 Month
» 281340 Year
» 3308193 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3770 |
30/05/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08603 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/05/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/05/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3770 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
05/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
26/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
24/06/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08603 |
|
|
31/01/1994 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08603 from Bescot (BS) |
|
|
08/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |
|
|