Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 88 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3705 Week
» 15410 Month
» 346899 Year
» 423486 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D3771 13/06/1959
TOPS (Tops) 08604 02/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 08
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Derby Works
To Service 13/06/1959
Withdrawn 16/07/1993 off Derby (DY)
Time in Service 34 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
9A Longsight (New) 13/06/1959
9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 11/07/1959
9A Longsight w/e 01/05/1965
   Withdrawn 16/07/1993

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
13/06/1959 To Service To service as D3771
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Longsight (9A)
   
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
01/05/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 08604    
16/07/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 08604 from Derby (DY)    

prev prev