Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 4011 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17417 Week
» 70433 Month
» 189960 Year
» 3216813 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3771 |
13/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08604 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
08 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Derby Works |
To Service |
13/06/1959 to Longsight (9A) |
Withdrawn |
16/07/1993 off Derby (DY) |
Time in Service |
34 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/06/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3771 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
11/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
01/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08604 |
|
|
16/07/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08604 from Derby (DY) |
|
|