Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1066 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18869 Week
» 71885 Month
» 191412 Year
» 3218265 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3773 |
27/06/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08606 |
04/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/06/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
27/06/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3773 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B) |
|
|
29/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
29/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
10/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (17B) |
|
|
26/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08606 |
|
|
29/02/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08606 from Stratford (SF) |
|
|
09/1989 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|