Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 775 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14181 Week
» 67197 Month
» 186724 Year
» 3213577 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3775 |
11/07/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08608 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/07/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3775 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Rowsley (17C) |
|
|
29/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rowsley (17C) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aston (21D) |
|
|
16/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (2E) |
|
|
16/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08608 |
|
|
20/11/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (TE) |
|
|
07/11/1988 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08608 from Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
13/05/1994 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|