Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1908 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19711 Week
» 72727 Month
» 192254 Year
» 3219107 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3776 |
11/07/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08609 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/07/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3776 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Rowsley (17C) |
|
|
29/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (17A) |
|
|
29/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kettering (15B) |
|
|
02/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kettering (15B) |
|
|
09/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
04/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15B) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08609 |
|
|
08/11/1993 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08609 from Willesden (WN) |
|
|
09/2000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|