Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1686 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15092 Week
» 68108 Month
» 187635 Year
» 3214488 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3777 |
25/07/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08610 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/07/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/07/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3777 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Kettering (15B) |
|
|
09/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
13/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Burton (16F) |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08610 |
|
|
26/06/1998 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08610 |
|
|
30/10/2004 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|