Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1045 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14451 Week
» 67467 Month
» 186994 Year
» 3213847 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3779 |
15/08/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08612 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/08/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/08/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3779 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Kettering (15B) |
|
|
29/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
17/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
08/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08612 |
|
|
21/09/1990 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 08612 from Old Oak Common (OC) |
|
|
28/03/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by MC Metals: Springburn |
|
|