Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 386 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18189 Week
» 71205 Month
» 190732 Year
» 3217585 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D3783 |
05/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08616 |
02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/09/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D3783 Built at Derby Works Allocated to Rose Grove (24B) |
|
|
27/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
21/03/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
01/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
08/01/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08616 |
|
|